Global Patent Index - EP 1266136 A2

EP 1266136 A2 2002-12-18 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REGULATING THE ENERGY SUPPLY FOR IGNITION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REGULATING THE ENERGY SUPPLY FOR IGNITION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES ENERGIEANGEBOTS FÜR DIE ZÜNDUNG IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE L'ALIMENTATION EN ENERGIE SERVANT A L'ALLUMAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1266136 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01919142 A

Priority

  • DE 0100689 W
  • DE 10012956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10012956A1] The ignition energy regulation device uses the central control unit for the IC engine for determining the time difference between the beginning of the current flow through the primary winding (4) of the ignition coil and the attainment of a given primary current threshold value, used for calculating the additional energy loss of the ignition end stage (13) and/or the effective energy reduction, for disconnection of the ignition end stage when an energy loss threshold value is reached. An independent claim for a method for regulating the ignition energy of an IC engine is also included.

[origin: DE10012956A1] The ignition energy regulation device uses the central control unit for the IC engine for determining the time difference between the beginning of the current flow through the primary winding (4) of the ignition coil and the attainment of a given primary current threshold value, used for calculating the additional energy loss of the ignition end stage (13) and/or the effective energy reduction, for disconnection of the ignition end stage when an energy loss threshold value is reached. An Independent claim for a method for regulating the ignition energy of an IC engine is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02P 3/05 (2006.01); F02P 3/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0169079A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10012956 A1 20010920; CN 1246581 C 20060322; CN 1418289 A 20030514; DE 50109759 D1 20060614; EP 1266136 A2 20021218; EP 1266136 B1 20060510; JP 2003527534 A 20030916; KR 100769756 B1 20071023; KR 20030007465 A 20030123; RU 2267646 C2 20060110; US 2003089353 A1 20030515; US 6763815 B2 20040720; WO 0169079 A2 20010920; WO 0169079 A3 20020307

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50109759

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50109759

- Effective date: 20140526

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109759 P 20060614

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR