Global Patent Index - EP 1283288 A3

EP 1283288 A3 2003-06-18 - Piecing arrangement in an openend rotor spinning machine

Title (en)

Piecing arrangement in an openend rotor spinning machine

Title (de)

Anspinnvorrichtung in einer Offenend-Rotorspinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de rattache pour un métier à filer à bout libre

Publication

EP 1283288 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02015125 A

Priority

DE 10139075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1283288A2] Yarn splicing, at an open-end spinning station, is operated by a computer to set the working of the drives while the mobile maintenance unit is present, to reduce the splicing times. The yarn splicing unit, at the bobbin winder (3) of an open-end spinning station (1), has a suction jet (4) with a step motor (6) drive, to carry the yarn end (9) from the bobbin to a transfer point at the yarn splicer (16). A centering plate (17) is at the bobbin winder, operated by a step motor or a pneumatic cylinder (55). Each station has a mechanical yarn store (60) with a drive (58), and a pneumatic yarn store jet (61). The yarn take-off has a take-off roller (63), operated by a reversible synchronous motor (59) with a free-rotating clamping roller (64). At the bobbin winder, the reciprocating yarn guide (24) is powered by a drive (57), and the winding drive drum (23) has a reversible motor (56). The drives (6,56,57,59) are linked to a control unit (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/50; D01H 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/08 (2006.01); D01H 1/115 (2006.01); D01H 4/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/30 (2013.01); B65H 67/081 (2013.01); D01H 1/115 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1283288 A2 20030212; EP 1283288 A3 20030618; EP 1283288 B1 20050914; CN 1279230 C 20061011; CN 1405374 A 20030326; CZ 20022341 A3 20030312; CZ 303882 B6 20130612; DE 10139075 A1 20030220; DE 50204234 D1 20051020; US 2003038206 A1 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50204234

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER SPINNING SOLUTIONS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50204234

- Effective date: 20130918

2009-12-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20090312

2008-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2008-05-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH

- Effective date: 20060609

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREIMASCHINENBAU AG

- Effective date: 20060609

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204234 P 20051020

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 01H 4/50 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 01H 4/30 B

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI