Global Patent Index - EP 1317963 A1

EP 1317963 A1 2003-06-11 - Trigger-type sprayer with stopper member

Title (en)

Trigger-type sprayer with stopper member

Title (de)

Hebelbetätigter Zerstäuber mit Stoppteil

Title (fr)

Pulvérisateur à gâchette avec dispositif d'arrêt

Publication

EP 1317963 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02023623 A

Priority

JP 2001373167 A

Abstract (en)

A sprayer eliminating the probability of loss of the stopper member which blocks the turn of the trigger lever, enabling the stopper member to be easily operated by one hand thus improving operability. A piston (21) is constituted by a first piston (18) and a second piston (22) coupled thereto in a manner to cover it. The second piston is covered by a pushing member (27). A stopper member (25) is provided to turn about the pushing member between a locking position and an unlocking in the direction in which the piston reciprocates. The pushing member has a hitting protuberance (27d) that hits the stopper member when the stopper member is turned to the locking position, and the stopper member has an escaping recess that escapes the hitting protuberance when the stopper member is turned to the unlocking position. When the stopper member is turned to the locking position, the pushing member is blocked from being pushed down. When the stopper member is turned to the unlocking position, the blocked state is reset. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/01 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3059 (2013.01); B05B 11/3014 (2013.01); B05B 11/3023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4278187 A 19810714 - LUEDTKE WARREN J
  • [A] US 4441633 A 19840410 - BENNETT ROBERT A [US]
  • [A] EP 0803295 A2 19971029 - MISTLON TECHNOLOGY B V [NL]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317963 A1 20030611; EP 1317963 B1 20090506; DE 60232219 D1 20090618; KR 100911854 B1 20090811; KR 20030047725 A 20030618; TW I222901 B 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090506

2010-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-11-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60232219 P 20090618

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2009-05-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMANO, HITOSHI

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UDAGAWA, TAKASHI

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UEDA, HIROYUKI

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI