Global Patent Index - EP 1319104 A1

EP 1319104 A1 2003-06-18 - SECURITY SHEET COMPRISING A TRANSPARENT OR TRANSLUCENT LAYER

Title (en)

SECURITY SHEET COMPRISING A TRANSPARENT OR TRANSLUCENT LAYER

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSBLATT, DAS EINE DURCHSICHTIGE ODER TRANSLUZENTE SCHICHT ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

FEUILLE DE SECURITE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE TRANSPARENTE OU TRANSLUCIDE

Publication

EP 1319104 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01969862 A

Priority

  • FR 0102803 W
  • FR 0011543 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220902A1] The invention concerns a coated security sheet comprising security elements, having high print rendering and resistance to circulation, characterised in that at least one of its surfaces is coated with a transparent or translucent layer comprising at least a colloidal silica and at least a transparent or translucent elastomeric binder, said binder being in particular polyurethane. The invention also concerns the method for making said sheet and a banknote obtained from said sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/40; D21H 21/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/40 (2006.01); D21H 21/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/40 (2013.01); D21H 19/40 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24529 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24893 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24901 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24909 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24934 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31993 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220902A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220902 A1 20020314; AT 377110 T 20071115; AU 8999601 A 20020322; BR 0113796 A 20030708; BR 0113796 B1 20121030; CA 2421984 A1 20020314; CA 2421984 C 20100112; CN 1245555 C 20060315; CN 1455833 A 20031112; CZ 20030607 A3 20041215; CZ 301138 B6 20091118; DE 60131180 D1 20071213; DE 60131180 T2 20080807; DK 1319104 T3 20080303; EP 1319104 A1 20030618; EP 1319104 B1 20071031; ES 2295209 T3 20080416; FR 2814476 A1 20020329; FR 2814476 B1 20030411; HU 0301682 A2 20030828; HU 229559 B1 20140228; PL 213020 B1 20121231; PL 361145 A1 20040920; PT 1319104 E 20080206; SK 2712003 A3 20060601; SK 287883 B6 20120203; TW I296663 B 20080511; US 2004023008 A1 20040205; US 8658273 B2 20140225

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-05-26 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080400265

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 377110 T

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-04-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131002

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295209 T3

2008-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2008-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400265

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080205

2008-02-06 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080125

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131180 P 20071213

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT