Global Patent Index - EP 1319154 A1

EP 1319154 A1 2003-06-18 - HEAT-SHIELD BRICK, COMBUSTION CHAMBER COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION CHAMBER LINING AND A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

HEAT-SHIELD BRICK, COMBUSTION CHAMBER COMPRISING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION CHAMBER LINING AND A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

HITZESCHILDSTEIN, BRENNKAMMER MIT EINER INNEREN BRENNKAMMERAUSKLEIDUNG SOWIE GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

BRIQUE DE PROTECTION THERMIQUE, CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION A GARNITURE INTERIEURE ET TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 1319154 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969734 A

Priority

  • EP 01969734 A
  • EP 0110790 W
  • EP 00120788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191285A1] The heat shield block has a hot side (3) exposed to the hot medium, a wall side (5) lying opposite and circumferential side (7) adjoining the hot side and wall side. The circumferential side has a tensioning element (11) pretensioned in the circumferential direction. A compressive stress is created normal to the circumferential side face (9). The tensioning element extends at least in areas in the circumferential direction. At least one tensioning element completely envelops the circumferential face. Independent claims are included for a combustion chamber with an inner combustion chamber lining with the proposed heat shield block, and for a gas turbine equipped with said combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; F23M 5/02; F27D 1/06; F27D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/06 (2006.01); F27D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/002 (2013.01); F23M 5/02 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F27D 1/0033 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00012 (2013.01); F27D 1/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191285 A1 20020327; CA 2423196 A1 20030320; CA 2423196 C 20091103; EP 1319154 A1 20030618; US 2003177770 A1 20030925; US 6832484 B2 20041221; WO 0225173 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160401

2014-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR