Global Patent Index - EP 1395747 B1

EP 1395747 B1 2004-12-22 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1395747 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02727264 A

Priority

  • DE 0201080 W
  • DE 10125943 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02097261A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines, comprising a valve body (1) in which a bore hole (3) is formed, said bore hole having a longitudinal axis (14). A valve seat (17) is formed on the combustion chamber side end of said bore hole. At least one injection opening (20) is situated in the region of the valve seat (17), connecting the bore hole (3) to the combustion chamber of the internal combustion engine. A valve element (5) is arranged in the bore hole (3) in a longitudinally displaceable manner, said valve element co-operating with the valve seat (17) by means of a sealing surface (15), in order to control the at least one injection opening (20). A pressure chamber (10) is formed between the wall of the bore hole (3) and the valve element (5), and can be filled with fuel under high pressure. The valve body (1) is surrounded by a housing (22) in the region of the pressure chamber (10), said housing comprising anisotropic properties of resistance, in such a way that the valve body (1) has less deformation due to the pressure in the pressure chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 02097261 A1 20021205; DE 10125943 A1 20021205; EP 1395747 A1 20040310; EP 1395747 B1 20041222; JP 2004519623 A 20040702; US 2004050972 A1 20040318; US 6832600 B2 20041221

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070323

2006-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201843 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR