Global Patent Index - EP 1491344 A2

EP 1491344 A2 2004-12-29 - System for supplying a printing apparatus

Title (en)

System for supplying a printing apparatus

Title (de)

Versorgungssystem für Druckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation pour appareil d'impression

Publication

EP 1491344 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04076854 A

Priority

IT MI20031305 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a primary hydraulic circuit (2) with a supply reservoir (21) of ink from which ink is supplied at a constant pressure. A secondary hydraulic circuit (3) has a pressure sensor (32) to sense ink pressure. A regulation electrovalve (31) of the circuit (3) is opened to maintain a depression in ink supply ducts of printing nozzles to an optimal value when ink drops from the nozzles.

A system for supplying a printing apparatus comprising a primary hydraulic circuit (2) that allows ink to flow from a supply reservoir (21) with a substantially constant pressure and a secondary hydraulic circuit (3), positioned between said primary circuit and a printhead (4). The secondary circuit comprises a regulation electrovalve (31), a second pressure sensor (32), an electronic regulation circuit (33) and a hydraulic pumping device (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491344 A2 20041229; EP 1491344 A3 20080326; IT MI20031305 A1 20041227; IT MI20031305 D0 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110104

2009-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOBOLD SISTEMI S.R.L.

2008-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: HR

2008-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK