Global Patent Index - EP 1684022 A4

EP 1684022 A4 2009-02-04 - OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE EXTERIEURE D'UN CLIMATISEUR

Publication

EP 1684022 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04788033 A

Priority

  • JP 2004013850 W
  • JP 2003333875 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1684022A1] There are provided a heat sink (10) to cool down electric components (C2) with a great heating value, the heat sink being projected from a side plate of an electric component box (9) provided to a machine chamber (4) in a case (1), a cooling duct (12) provided along the side plate of the electric component box from which the heat sink is projected, the cooling duct covering the heat sink (10) and comprising openings (12a, 12b) formed in a horizontal partition plate (2) and a base plate of the case, and the cooling duct introducing outside air from the opening (12b) at the base plate of the case accompanying an operation of an air blower (6) to exchange heat with the heat sink (10), and then leading the air out of the opening (12a) of the horizontal partition plate, and a vent hole (13) formed in the side plate of an electric component box (9), the vent hole conducting air in the electric component box (9) and guiding the air so as to be discharged into the cooling duct (12).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/50 (2013.01); F24F 1/24 (2013.01); F24F 2013/207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1684022 A1 20060726; EP 1684022 A4 20090204; EP 1684022 B1 20170621; CN 100425918 C 20081015; CN 1860337 A 20061108; ES 2629957 T3 20170816; JP 2010169393 A 20100805; JP 4520412 B2 20100804; JP WO2005031219 A1 20071115; KR 100726509 B1 20070611; KR 20060085636 A 20060727; WO 2005031219 A1 20050407

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180322

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171002

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2629957 T3

- Effective date: 20170816

2017-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2017-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-02-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170110

2011-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110111

2009-02-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2007-01-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-01-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT

2006-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060317

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT