EP 1703110 A1 20060920 - Method for optimising the calibration of an internal combustion engine
Title (en)
Method for optimising the calibration of an internal combustion engine
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Optimierung der Kalibrierung eines Verbrennungsmotors
Title (fr)
Méthode d'optimisation de la calibration d'un moteur à explosion
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 05102151 A 20050318
Abstract (en)
Method involves starting of calibration test for start condition and for calibration definite changes in the parameter are to be adjusted. At least two of the parameters, throttle valve position (2) or load, fuel-air relationship (4), firing angle (5), exhaust gas lead line (6), amount of fuel e.t.c. are to be changed in defined order. The parameters also includes injection pressure, guide blade position of a turbo compressor with variable blade position, valve lift and injecting modulation.
IPC 8 full level
F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F02D 41/1405 (2013.01); F02D 41/2432 (2013.01); F02D 41/1406 (2013.01); F02D 41/2477 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1433 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- DE 10020448 A1 20011031 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]
- DE 19741973 C1 19990422 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]
Citation (search report)
- [DY] DE 10020448 A1 20011031 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]
- [A] EP 1387067 A2 20040204 - TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]
- [DY] MATTHIAS SCHÜLER, MICHAEL HAFNER, ROLF ISERMANN: "Einsatz schneller neuronaler Netzte zur modellbasierten Optimierung von Verbrennungsmotoren", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, no. 61, October 2000 (2000-10-01), pages 704 - 711, XP002341168
- [A] KNOEDLER K ET AL: "MODELLBASIERTE ONLINE-OPTIMIERUNG MODERNER VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN TEIL 2: GRENZEN DES FAHRBAREN SUCHRAUMS", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, VIEWEG, WIESBADEN, DE, vol. 64, no. 6, June 2003 (2003-06-01), pages 520 - 526, XP001164053, ISSN: 0024-8525
Citation (examination)
CHRIS ATKINSON ET AL: "2005-01-0026 Dynamic Model-Based Calibration Optimization: An Introduction and Application to Diesel Engines SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES", SAE WORLD CONGRESS DETROIT, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 1 - 12, XP055260790
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05102151 A 20050318