Global Patent Index - EP 1763007 A3

EP 1763007 A3 2007-10-17 - Method for driving display panel

Title (en)

Method for driving display panel

Title (de)

Ansteuerverfahren für eine Anzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un panneau d'affichage

Publication

EP 1763007 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06018461 A

Priority

JP 2005259095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1763007A2] A method for driving a display panel having capability to provide good image display with suppressed flickers and dither patterns respectively assigns brightness weight values to a plurality of successive display lines belonging to each of display line groups. An emission period within a unit display period of one pixel cell belonging to one display line differs from that of another pixel cell belonging to another display line based on this brightness weight values. In this instance, the emission operation of the pixel cell during this emission period is separated into a first half section and a latter half section within a unit display period. Further, relationship of the length of an emission period in the first half section to that in the latter half section is reversed between one discharge cell belonging to one display line and another discharge cell belonging to another display line among the same display line group.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/28 (2006.01); G09G 3/288 (2006.01); G09G 3/293 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2935 (2013.01); G09G 3/2029 (2013.01); G09G 3/204 (2013.01); G09G 3/2051 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 2310/06 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0247 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1763007 A2 20070314; EP 1763007 A3 20071017; KR 20070028263 A 20070312

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090408

2008-12-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081127

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080415

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU