Global Patent Index - EP 1838479 A2

EP 1838479 A2 2007-10-03 - METALLIC POWDER MIXTURES

Title (en)

METALLIC POWDER MIXTURES

Title (de)

METALLISCHE PULVERMISCHUNGEN

Title (fr)

MELANGES EN POUDRES METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 1838479 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06706174 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000085 W
  • DE 102005001198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: TW200635680A] The invention relates to blends of metal, alloy or composite powders having a maximum mean particle diameter D50 of 75, preferably a maximum of 25μm, which are produced according to a process in which a base powder is first transformed into flake-like particles and these are then crushed in the presence of milling auxiliary agents, with further additives and also the use of these powder blends and moulded objects produced from them.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/0055 (2013.01); B22F 1/0003 (2013.01); C22C 33/0207 (2013.01); B22F 2003/023 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/23993 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 1/0055

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006072586 A2 20060713; CA 2593671 A1 20060713; CN 102015163 A 20110413; DE 102005001198 A1 20060720; EP 1838479 A2 20071003; JP 2008527167 A 20080724; KR 20070094032 A 20070919; RU 2007130509 A 20090220; TW 200635680 A 20061016; US 2009123690 A1 20090514

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20170721

2017-07-21 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-02-15 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-02-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

2012-01-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111209

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070810

2009-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-09 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20060713

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU