Global Patent Index - EP 1839399 A1

EP 1839399 A1 2007-10-03 - PROGRAM DIVERSITY

Title (en)

PROGRAM DIVERSITY

Title (de)

PROGRAMMDIVERSITY

Title (fr)

DIVERSITE DE PROGRAMME

Publication

EP 1839399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05813614 A

Priority

  • EP 2005013189 W
  • DE 102005002425 A
  • DE 102005039507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006076948A1] A method for receiving high frequency signals, wherein several receiver antennas receive said signals and transmit the signals of one antenna to a receiver, representing a selectable program content. It is possible to select at least one other antenna which receives signals with the same program content but with better signal properties. According to the invention, the signals received by at least one antenna are examined for the data content thereof and it is possible to switch from one signal received by an antenna to another signal received by an antenna if the data content of one signal corresponds to the data content of the other signal or if, when the signals received by at least two antennas are examined for the data content thereof, it is possible to switch to another signal received by another antenna if the data content of the signal that is received by one antenna corresponds to the data content of the other signal received by another antenna.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/08 (2006.01); H04B 7/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44 (2013.01); H04B 7/082 (2013.01); H04B 7/12 (2013.01); H04N 21/44209 (2013.01); H04N 21/4622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006076948A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006076948 A1 20060727; DE 102005039507 A1 20060817; EP 1839399 A1 20071003; JP 2008527938 A 20080724; NO 20074194 A 20071018; RU 2007131364 A 20090227; RU 2426233 C2 20110810; US 2008200137 A1 20080821

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-11-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HIRSCHMANN CAR COMMUNICATION GMBH

2010-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADAM, THOMAS

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWARZ, CHRISTIAN

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAUSTERER, MARKUS

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: D'ARGENT, FRANK

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR