Global Patent Index - EP 1844341 A1

EP 1844341 A1 2007-10-17 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR VERIFYING ELECTRIC CONTACTS BETWEEN A FIRST OUTPUT PIN OF A FIRST POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER OF A POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICE AND AN EXTERNAL NODE AND A SECOND OUTPUT PIN OF A SECOND POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER OF SAID POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICE AND NODE

Title (en)

METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR VERIFYING ELECTRIC CONTACTS BETWEEN A FIRST OUTPUT PIN OF A FIRST POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER OF A POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICE AND AN EXTERNAL NODE AND A SECOND OUTPUT PIN OF A SECOND POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER OF SAID POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER DEVICE AND NODE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTIERUNGEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ERSTEN AUSGANGSPIN EINES ERSTEN LEISTUNGSSCHALTERS EINER LEISTUNGSSCHALTVORRICHTUNG UND EINEM EXTERNEN KNOTEN UND EINEM ZWEITEN AUSGANGSPIN EINES ZWEITEN LEISTUNGSSCHALTERS DER LEISTUNGSSCHALTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR SURVEILLER LES CONTACTS ELECTRIQUES ENTRE UNE PREMIERE BROCHE DE SORTIE D'UN PREMIER COMMUTATEUR PLACE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION ET UN NOEUD EXTERNE ET UNE SECONDE BROCHE DE SORTIE D'UN SECOND COMMUTATEUR DU DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION ET DU NOEUD

Publication

EP 1844341 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05816268 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056236 W
  • DE 102005004608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005004608B3] Resistors (7,8) are connected to form voltage divider between test voltage (Vt) and earth (13). Comparators (11,12) test if electrical contact (1a) exists between output pin (2) and power switch (3) and contact (1b) exists between output pin (4) and power switch (5). Comparator (11) compares first voltage (U1) at output pin (2) with first reference voltage (Uref) and second comparator (12) compares second voltage (U2) at output pin (4) with reference voltage. An interruption of contact 1a or 1b indicated by the voltage logic level, shows that the device (6) is faulty. An independent claim is also included for a circuit arrangement for verifying of electrical contact between an output pin (2,4) of a power switch (3,5) and an external node.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 19/165 (2006.01); H03K 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 19/16538 (2013.01); H03K 17/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081881A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004608 B3 20060420; CN 100549703 C 20091014; CN 101111773 A 20080123; EP 1844341 A1 20071017; JP 2008528979 A 20080731; KR 101206893 B1 20121130; KR 20070105352 A 20071030; US 2008150539 A1 20080626; US 7719286 B2 20100518; WO 2006081881 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-05-19 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100412

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT