Global Patent Index - EP 2003735 A9

EP 2003735 A9 2009-02-11 - TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BORNE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 2003735 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 07739674 A

Priority

  • JP 2007056236 W
  • JP 2006085752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2003735A2] To provide a terminal which makes it possible to save material, has a small number of production steps and high productivity, and a method for producing the same. Therefore, butt surfaces of a pair of forming dies 20, 20 and side surfaces of a linear conductive material 11 having a square shape in cross section are disposed parallel to one another. Then, a cutting recess 13 is formed on the linear conductive material 11 including ridge lines 12 by first pressing surfaces 21, each provided on each of the butt surfaces. At the same time, an annular tapered surface 14 continuous with the cutting recess 13 is formed by second pressing surfaces 22, each provided along an upper side edge portion of the first pressing surface 21. Thereafter, the cutting recess 13 is cut so that a unit-length terminal 10 is cut out.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2013.01); B21F 11/00 (2013.01); B21F 99/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 2003735 A2 20081217; EP 2003735 A4 20120118; EP 2003735 A9 20090211; CN 101416356 A 20090422; CN 101416356 B 20120104; JP 2007265657 A 20071011; JP 4618178 B2 20110126; US 2009104798 A1 20090423; US 8341999 B2 20130101; WO 2007116691 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130830

2012-01-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/04 20060101AFI20111212BHEP

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 43/16 20060101ALI20111212BHEP

2009-04-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIRANO, KAZUHIROC/O OMRON CORPORATION

2008-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT