Global Patent Index - EP 2019950 A1

EP 2019950 A1 2009-02-04 - AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

CLIMATISEUR

Publication

EP 2019950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07746591 A

Priority

  • KR 2007002443 W
  • KR 20060045429 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136204A1] Provided is an air conditioner. According to the air conditioner, an installation structure of an indoor heat exchanger installed inside the air conditioner is improved, so that the air conditioner become slim and an installation space for additional devices such as a filter can be secured. According to the air conditioner, the indoor heat exchanger divides a passage of air introduced into a main unit into an upper passage and a lower passage, so that interference between the upper and lower passages can be minimized, and thus operation efficiency of the air conditioner can improve. Also, a space of a predetermined size is formed between the indoor heat exchanger and air intake holes to receive a predetermined device such as a filter and a negative ion generator that can give a separate function to the air conditioner.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0014 (2013.01); F24F 1/0033 (2013.01); F24F 1/0059 (2013.01); F24F 1/0025 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136204 A1 20071129; CN 101449107 A 20090603; EP 2019950 A1 20090204; EP 2019950 A4 20120229; KR 100826028 B1 20080428; KR 20070112335 A 20071123; US 2009113915 A1 20090507

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121219

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-02-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120127

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 1/00 20110101AFI20120123BHEP

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS