Global Patent Index - EP 2020482 A2

EP 2020482 A2 2009-02-04 - Liner Hanger, Running Tool and Method

Title (en)

Liner Hanger, Running Tool and Method

Title (de)

Leitungshänger, Einbauwerkzeug und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Suspension de colonne perdue, outil de pose et procédé associé

Publication

EP 2020482 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08105836 A

Priority

  • EP 06012127 A
  • EP 02736875 A
  • US 29204901 P
  • US 31645901 P
  • US 94385401 A
  • US 94370101 A
  • US 31657201 P
  • US 98148701 A
  • US 8332001 A
  • US 494501 A
  • US 458801 A
  • US 13696902 A
  • US 13699202 A

Abstract (en)

A tool for use in a subterranean well to seal with a generally cylindrical interior surface of a tubular or another downhole tool, the tool comprising: a conveyance tubular for positioning the tool at a selected location below the surface of the well; an annular seal assembly disposed about the conveyance tubular, the seal assembly having a reduced diameter run-in position and an expanded sealing position; a wedge ring having a substantially conical outer surface configured to radially expand the annual seal assembly upon axial movement of the annular seal assembly relative to the wedge ring such that the seal assembly is expanded from its run-in position to its expanded sealing position wherein the seal assembly is in sealing engagement with the generally cylindrical interior surface; and the annular seal assembly including a metal framework having a radially inward annular base and a plurality of metal ribs each extending radially outward from the base, the metal framework including an upper downwardly angled primary seal metal rib for sealing pressure below the seal assembly, a lower upwardly angled primary seal metal rib for sealing pressure above the seal assembly, a primary elastomeric seal in a cavity readially outward from the base and axially between the upper primary seal metal rib and the lower primary seal metal rib, an upper downwardly angled secondary seal metal rib spaced axially above the upper primary seal metal rib, and a lower upwardly angled secondary seal metal rib spaced axially below the lower primary seal metal rib.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/04 (2006.01); E21B 23/01 (2006.01); E21B 23/06 (2006.01); E21B 33/04 (2006.01); E21B 33/12 (2006.01); E21B 43/10 (2006.01); E21B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/01 (2013.01); E21B 23/04 (2013.01); E21B 23/06 (2013.01); E21B 33/04 (2013.01); E21B 33/1212 (2013.01); E21B 33/1216 (2013.01); E21B 43/10 (2013.01); E21B 2033/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1712729 A2 20061018; EP 1712729 A3 20061227; EP 1712729 B1 20110720; BR 122013000180 B1 20160719; DK 1712729 T3 20111024; DK 1712730 T3 20110124; DK 2020482 T3 20121022; EP 1712730 A2 20061018; EP 1712730 A3 20061227; EP 1712730 B1 20101215; EP 1712731 A1 20061018; EP 1712731 B1 20090902; EP 1712732 A1 20061018; EP 1712732 B1 20090715; EP 2020482 A2 20090204; EP 2020482 A3 20110427; EP 2020482 B1 20120926

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130627

2012-10-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-09-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1712729 P

2012-09-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1392953 P

2012-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB

2012-09-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB

2011-12-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB

2009-02-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1712729 P

2009-02-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1392953 P

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB