Global Patent Index - EP 2021826 A1

EP 2021826 A1 2009-02-11 - SONAR IMAGING SYSTEM WITH A SYNTHETIC APERTURE

Title (en)

SONAR IMAGING SYSTEM WITH A SYNTHETIC APERTURE

Title (de)

SONARABBILDUNGSSYSTEM MIT SYNTHETISCHER ÖFFNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE SONAR A OUVERTURE SYNTHETIQUE

Publication

EP 2021826 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07766049 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051275 W
  • FR 0651762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132126A1] The invention relates to a sonar system with a synthetic antenna, comprising: a sonar provided with transmission means and reception means and located on a mobile carrier, the reception means comprising a composite physical antenna having N transducers; an inertial central station which is arranged on the carrier and can measure instantaneous information relating to the position and orientation of the carrier; a common clock supplying a temporal signal enabling the synchronisation of both the inertial central station and the sonar; a means for determining the instantaneous speed of the carrier, the speed determined feeding the inertial central station in order to correct the drift thereof; and micronavigation means enabling an image of the marine life to be obtained by the formation of paths of the synthetic antenna from K operation returns of the sonar, taking into account the fact that the physical antenna movement during the displacement of the carrier is known in its entirety from the information measured by the inertial central station.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/89 (2006.01); G01S 7/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 7/52004 (2013.01); G01S 15/8904 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007132126 A1 20071122; CA 2652566 A1 20071122; CA 2652566 C 20160223; EP 2021826 A1 20090211; FR 2901364 A1 20071123; FR 2901364 B1 20080822; JP 2009537810 A 20091029; NO 20085011 A 20090211; US 2009175128 A1 20090709; US 7933167 B2 20110426

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IXBLUE

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JEAN, FREDERIC

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARLOT, DIDIER

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAPOLITANO, FABIEN

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS