EP 2022264 A4 20090805 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TTI DATA SERVICE
Title (en)
SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TTI DATA SERVICE
Title (de)
SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES TTI-DATENDIENSTES
Title (fr)
SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION DE SERVICE DE DONNÉES TTI
Publication
Application
Priority
- KR 2007002278 W 20070509
- KR 20060042108 A 20060510
- KR 20060125140 A 20061208
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2007129865A1] Provided are a system and method for providing a Traffic and Travel Information (TTI) data service related to a video service in digital broadcasting. A transmission device for providing a Traffic and Travel Information (TTI) data service related to a video service in digital broadcasting, the transmission device including: an encoding unit for a specific scene of a video to be broadcasted, TTI data related to a specific scene, and link data for linking the specific scene with the TTI data; and a broadcasting stream creating unit for creating a transmission stream in conformity to a broadcasting standard based on the video data, the TTI data, and the encoded and outputted link data.
IPC 8 full level
H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
H04H 20/30 (2013.01 - EP); H04H 20/40 (2013.01 - EP); H04H 20/55 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 7/08 (2013.01 - KR); H04N 21/234318 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/235 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/41422 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/43072 (2020.08 - EP KR US); H04N 21/4312 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/4314 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/4349 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/435 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/44012 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/4722 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/488 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/6112 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/6131 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/6143 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8133 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/814 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8146 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/816 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8586 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 1617656 A2 20060118 - LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]
- [X] KR 20040040896 A 20040513 - KIA MOTORS CORP
- [X] EP 1493994 A1 20050105 - HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]
- [A] EP 0827092 A2 19980304 - IBM [US]
- [A] WO 9835499 A1 19980813 - TEEMS ANTON RUDOLF V D [NL], et al
- See references of WO 2007129865A1
Citation (examination)
- SAMMO CHO ET AL: "An efficient transmission of traffic and traveler information using digital multimedia broadcasting network", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2005. VTC-2005-FALL. 2005 IEEE 62ND DALLAS, TX, USA 25-28 SEPT., 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, vol. 4, 25 September 2005 (2005-09-25), pages 2749 - 2752, XP010879064, ISBN: 978-0-7803-9152-9, DOI: 10.1109/VETECF.2005.1559050
- KIM GEON ET AL: "Design and Implementation of T-DMB Receiver for Offering Traffic and Traveler Information", 2006 IEEE 64TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE : VTC 2006-FALL ; 25 - 28 SEPTEMBER 2006, MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA, PISCATAWAY, NJ : IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, 1 September 2006 (2006-09-01), pages 1 - 4, XP031051629, ISBN: 978-1-4244-0062-1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2007129865 A1 20071115; EP 2022264 A1 20090211; EP 2022264 A4 20090805; KR 100835179 B1 20080605; KR 20070109783 A 20071115
DOCDB simple family (application)
KR 2007002278 W 20070509; EP 07746431 A 20070509; KR 20060125140 A 20061208