Global Patent Index - EP 2024546 A2

EP 2024546 A2 2009-02-18 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AND CUTTING VINYL TILES WITH ROLLED EDGES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AND CUTTING VINYL TILES WITH ROLLED EDGES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN UND SCHNEIDEN VON VINYLFLIESEN MIT ROLLRÄNDERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FORMER ET DE DECOUPER DES CARREAUX VINYLIQUES AUX BORDS LAMINES

Publication

EP 2024546 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07749945 A

Priority

  • US 2007003039 W
  • US 44576106 A
  • CA 2558989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007142706A2] A press forming-and-cutting method and a related device are structured to produce vinyl tile with rolled edges. A press forming-and-cutting die and related mechanisms are structured to form and cut vinyl tile that has been rolled and surface-finished to produce an end-product of vinyl tile with rolled edges in a single integrated operation. The press forming-and-cutting die is driven by a hydraulic press system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 11/00 (2006.01); B26D 3/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01); B29C 51/32 (2006.01); B29C 67/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26D 3/085 (2013.01); B26F 1/38 (2013.01); B26F 1/40 (2013.01); B29C 43/40 (2013.01); B29C 43/50 (2013.01); B29C 67/0044 (2013.01); B26D 9/00 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0093 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4427 (2013.01); B26F 2210/06 (2013.01); B29C 51/082 (2013.01); B29C 2043/503 (2013.01); B29C 2793/0009 (2013.01); B29K 2027/06 (2013.01); B29L 2031/104 (2013.01); B29L 2031/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007142706 A2 20071213; WO 2007142706 A3 20080221; EP 2024546 A2 20090218; EP 2024546 A4 20091111

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-11-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090915

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D04H 11/00 20060101AFI20080225BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 7/06 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26F 1/44 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 51/32 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 3/08 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 67/00 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-10-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26F 1/38 20060101ALI20090909BHEP

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS