Global Patent Index - EP 2025805 A2

EP 2025805 A2 2009-02-18 - Device for cutting a woven broadcloth into strips

Title (en)

Device for cutting a woven broadcloth into strips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen eines Breitgewebes in Bänder

Title (fr)

Dispositif destiné à couper un tissu large en bandes

Publication

EP 2025805 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012650 A

Priority

DE 102007036503 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a strut and/or an anti-strut formed in two-pieces. The strut is established from a fixed stationary part (46) and an interconnected movable part (45). The stationary part has a guide (42) or an anti-guide, and the movable part has a rotary fastening part or rotary anti-fastening part. A power generator is provided to move away the movable part from the stationary part and to maintain a rotary warp section (25) in a tight manner. The power generator is arranged between the stationary part and the movable part.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung (30) dient zum Weben eines Breitgewebes (10) und zum Trennen des Breitgewebes in Bänder (10') mittels beheizter Schneiddrähte (20). Im Bereich des Schneidbereiches gibt es ein Druck- und ein Gegendruckglied (40;50) auf gegenüberliegenden Seiten (15, 16) des Gewebes (10), das durch eine Transportrichtung unter Längsspannung gehalten wird. Das Druck- und Gegendruckglied (40; 50) sorgen für eine Nachbehandlung der im Trennschnittbereich entstehenden Schmelzkanten (29) zwischen benachbarten Bändern. Für eine Verbesserung des Trennschnitts wird vorgeschlagen, mindestens das Druckglied (40) zweiteilig auszubilden und in einen ortsfesten Stationärteil (46) und einen damit verbundenen Bewegungsteil (45) zu gliedern. Der Stationärteil (46) hat eine Führung (42) für das Gewebe und den Schneiddraht (20), die mit einer Gegenführung im Gegendruckglied (50) ausgerichtet ist. Der Bewegungsteil (45) trägt die eine Draht-Befestigungsstelle (26), während die andere Draht-Gegenbefestigungsstelle (66) sich am Gegendruckglied (50) befindet. Ein Kraftgenerator ist bestrebt, den Bewegungsteil (45) vom Stationärteil (46) wegzubewegen. Dadurch wird ein zwischen der Führung (42) der Gegenführung verlaufender Draht-Wirkabschnitt (25) stramm gehalten (Fig. 2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/04 (2006.01); B26F 3/12 (2006.01); D06H 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/22 (2013.01); B26F 3/12 (2013.01); D06H 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025805 A2 20090218; EP 2025805 A3 20090708; EP 2025805 B1 20130731; DE 102007036503 B3 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008010393

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140712

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010393

- Effective date: 20140502

2014-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140502

2013-09-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008010393

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH

2013-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2013-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2010-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS