EP 2318590 A1 20110511 - LOAD-BEARING SURFACE
Title (en)
LOAD-BEARING SURFACE
Title (de)
LASTTRAGFLÄCHE
Title (fr)
SURFACE DE PORT DE CHARGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- DK 2009050176 W 20090714
- DK PA200801012 A 20080718
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010006617A1] Load bearing surface to be arranged on a foundation layer (4), wherein the surface comprises a reinforcement in the shape of a reinforcement netting (2), which netting by means of distance keepers (3) is elevated above the foundation layer, where means are provided for improving the connection between the load bearing surface and the foundation layer, and that the surface layer consists of a layer of ultra high strength concrete or a semi-flexible cement and bitumen containing, where said layer has a thickness of between 30 and 80 mm, and where said surface layer is free of joints.
IPC 8 full level
E01C 11/18 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
E01C 11/165 (2013.01); E01C 11/18 (2013.01); E04C 5/125 (2013.01); E04C 5/18 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2010006617A1
Citation (examination)
BUITELAAR P: "Ultra Thin Heavy Reinforced High Perfomance Concrete Overlays", 6TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON UTALIZATION OF HIGH STRENGTH/HIGH PERFORMANCE CONCRETE,, vol. 2, 1 June 2002 (2002-06-01), pages 1577 - 1590, XP003032180
Citation (third parties)
Third party :
- ANONYMOUS: "Contec Ferroplan System, About Ferroplan", 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 1 - 2, XP003033026, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:file:///E:/Ferroplan%20com%20website/pages/003_about_ferroplan/03_00x.html> [retrieved on 20130714]
- BUITELAAR P.: "Ultra Thin Heavy Reinforced High Perfomance Concrete Overlays", 6TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON UTALIZATION OF HIGH STRENGTH/HIGH PERFORMANCE CONCRETE, vol. 2, 1 June 2002 (2002-06-01), pages 1577 - 1590, XP003032180
- BUITELAAR P.: "Zeer dunne overlagingen met hogesterktemortels", CEMENT, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 46 - 49, XP003032179
- BelaegningsNyt, Det gamle gulv, Star Skandia, page 1-24
- KANNEMEYER L. ET AL: "Ultra-Thin CRCP: Modeling, Testing under Accelerated Pavement Testing and Field Applications for Roads", 2006, pages 1 - 20, XP003033022
- MÜNGER F. ET AL: "Concrete overlays for concrete structures, design and case studies", HILTI CORP, pages 1 - 12, XP003033023
- MÜNGER F.: "Concrete repair bonding", HILTI CORP, pages 1 - 12, XP003033024
- "Dagproductie beeindiging met anker en stel mogelijkheid", CONTEC APS PBU, 15 March 2003 (2003-03-15), pages 1 - 9, XP003033025
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
DK 2009050176 W 20090714; EP 09776242 A 20090714