EP 2338955 A1 20110629 - Selective removal of aromatics
Title (en)
Selective removal of aromatics
Title (de)
Selektives Entfernen von Aromaten
Title (fr)
Suppression sélective d'aromatiques
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 09252723 A 20091203
Abstract (en)
According to the present invention there is provided a process for reducing the concentration of one or more aromatic compounds in a feedstock comprising one or more aromatic compounds and one or more olefinic compounds, which process comprises contacting the feedstock with an ionic liquid comprising an anionic component and a cationic component to produce a product with a higher mole ratio of olefinic compounds to aromatic compounds than the feedstock, and an ionic liquid phase with a lower mole ratio of olefinic compounds to aromatic compounds than the feedstock, wherein the surface charge profile of the cationic component has a maximum value at a charge density value (Ã) in the range -0.0085 < Ã < -0.0040 e/Å 2 , and wherein from 25% to 65% of the molecular surface area of the anionic component has a charge density value (Ã) in the range -0.0085 < Ã < +0.0085 e/Å 2 , where e represents the charge of an electron.
IPC 8 full level
B01D 11/04 (2006.01); C07C 7/10 (2006.01); C10G 21/06 (2006.01); C10G 21/27 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C10G 21/06 (2013.01); C10G 21/27 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 1965956 A 19340710
- US 5449452 A 19950912 - SUDHAKAR CHAKKA [US], et al
- GB 1008921 A 19651103 - SHELL INT RESEARCH
- EP 1854786 A1 20071114 - BP PLC [GB]
- US 7019188 B2 20060328 - SMITH RONALD SCOTT [CA], et al
- US 6623659 B2 20030923 - MUNSON CURTIS L [US], et al
- DE 10154052 A1 20030710 - CARL V OSSIETZKY UNI OLDENBURG [DE]
- US 2007227948 A1 20071004 - RAMIREZ-CORREDORES M M [VE], et al
- PLATINUM METALS REVIEW, vol. 5, no. 1, 1961, pages 9 - 12
- "Kirk-Othmer Encyclopaedia of Chemical Technology", vol. 17, pages: 218 - 221
- "Kirk-Othmer Encyclopaedia of Chemical Technology", vol. 17, pages: 205 - 211
- SERGEANT ET AL., FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, vol. 41, 1995, pages 147 - 157
- MEINDERSMA ET AL., CHEM. ENG. RES. DESIGN, vol. 86, 2008, pages 745 - 752
- MEINDERSMA ET AL., FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, vol. 87, 2005, pages 59 - 70
- MEINDERSMA ET AL., AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS ANNUAL MEETING, 2004
- CHEM. ENG. RES. DESIGN, vol. 86, 2008, pages 745 - 752
- FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, vol. 247, 2006, pages 158 - 168
- MEINDERSMA ET AL., CHEM. ENG. COMM., vol. 193, no. 11, 2006, pages 1384 - 1396
- ZHU ET AL., SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, vol. 56, 2007, pages 237 - 240
- MADURO ET AL., FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, vol. 265, 2008, pages 129 - 138
- ZHANG ET AL., ENERGY & FUELS, vol. 21, 2007, pages 1724 - 30
- ANJAN, CHEM. ENG. PROGRESS, vol. 102, no. 12, 2006, pages 30 - 39
- KLAMT: "COSMO-RS, From Quantum Chemistry to Fluid Phase Thermodynamics and Drug Design", 2005, ELSEVIER
- MEINDERSMA ET AL., CHEM. ENG. RES. DESIGN, vol. 86, 2008
Citation (search report)
- [AD] EP 1854786 A1 20071114 - BP PLC [GB]
- [AD] DE 10154052 A1 20030710 - CARL V OSSIETZKY UNI OLDENBURG [DE]
- [X] G. WYTZE MEINDERSMA, LARA M. GALAN SANCHEZ, ANTJE R. HANSMEIER, ANDRE B. DE HAAN: "Application of Task-specific Ionic liquids for Intensified Separations", CHEMICAL MONTHLY, vol. 138, 27 October 2007 (2007-10-27), The Netherlands, pages 1125 - 1136, XP002584493
- [X] KUMAR A A P ET AL: "Thiophene separation with ionic liquids for desulphurization: A quantum chemical approach", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, ELSEVIER LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.FLUID.2008.11.019, vol. 278, no. 1-2, 15 April 2009 (2009-04-15), pages 1 - 8, XP026007343, ISSN: 0378-3812, [retrieved on 20081206]
- [X] GEERT WYTZE MEINDERSMA: "Extraction of Aromatics from Naphtha with Ionic Liquids", 28 July 2005 (2005-07-28), XP002584494, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://doc.utwente.nl/50805/1/thesis_Meindersma.pdf> [retrieved on 20100527]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 09252723 A 20091203