EP 2363853 A1 20110907 - A method for estimating the clean spectrum of a signal
Title (en)
A method for estimating the clean spectrum of a signal
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Schätzung des rauschfreien Spektrums eines Signals
Title (fr)
Procédé d'estimation du spectre propre d'un signal
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 10450036 A 20100304
Abstract (en)
The invention proposes a method for estimating the clean spectrum of a signal degraded by additive noise, in particular a speech signal, by determining the coefficients of a predictive model of said clean spectrum, comprising: computing the spectrum of said signal; estimating the power spectrum of said noise; and determining said coefficients by minimizing the cost function « 2 ¢ À ¢ | X É ¢ | 2 H É 2 + S V É - log ¢ | X É ¢ | 2 H É 2 + S V É ¢ dÉ with respect to said coefficients, with X ( É ) being the spectrum of said signal, S v ( É ) being the power spectrum of said noise, and H ( É ) being the transfer function of said model based on said coefficients.
IPC 8 full level
G10L 21/02 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 25/12 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 25/12 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- WO 2008109904 A1 20080918 - OESTERREICHISCHE AKADEMIE DER [AT], et al
- Y. EPHRAIM; D. MALAH: "Speech enhancement using a minimum mean-square error short-time spectral amplitude estimator", IEEE TRANS. ACOUST., SPEECH, SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 32, no. 6, 1984, pages 1109 - 1121
- B. SIM; Y. TONG; J. CHANG; C. TAN: "A parametric formulation of the generalized spectral subtraction method", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, vol. 6, no. 4, July 1998 (1998-07-01), pages 328 - 337
- P. J. WOLFE; S. J. GODSILL: "Efficient alternatives to the Ephraim and Malah suppression rule for au dio signal enhancement", EURASIP J. APPLIED SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 2003, no. 10, 2003, pages 1043 - 1051
- P. C. LOIZOU: "Speech enhancement: Theory and practice", 2007, CRC PRESS
- J. H. L. HANSEN; M. A. CLEMENTS: "Constrained iterative speech enhancement with application to speech, recognition", IEEE TRANS. SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 39, no. 4, April 1991 (1991-04-01), pages 795 - 805
- E. ZA- VAREHEI; S. VASEGHI; Q. YAN: "Speech enhancement using Kalman filters for restoration of short-time DFT trajectories", IEEE WORKSHOP AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING, 2005, pages 313 - 318
- T. V. SREENIVAS; P. KIRNAPURE: "Codebook constrained Wiener filtering for speech enhancement", IEEE TRANS. SPEECH, AUDIO PROCESSING, vol. 4, no. 5, September 1996 (1996-09-01), pages 383 - 389
Citation (search report)
- [AD] EP 1970893 A1 20080917 - OESTERREICHISCHE AKADEMIE DER [AT], et al
- [A] WO 2008031124 A1 20080320 - UNIV GRAZ TECH [AT], et al
- [A] K. FUNAKI: "Speech enhancement based on iterative Wiener filter using complex speech analysis", PROC. EUSIPCO 2008, 29 August 2008 (2008-08-29), Lausanne, Switzerland, pages 1 - 5, XP002593133, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.eurasip.org/Proceedings/Eusipco/Eusipco2008/papers/1569105040.pdf> [retrieved on 20100722]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA ME RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 10450036 A 20100304