EP 3198522 A1 20170802 - A FACE POSE RECTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS
Title (en)
A FACE POSE RECTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERICHTIGUNG VON GESICHTSPOSEN
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECTIFICATION DE POSE DE VISAGE
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 2014070282 W 20140923
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016045711A1] A pose rectification method for rectifying a pose in data representing face (100) images, comprising the steps of: A-acquiring a least one test frame including 2D near infrared image data, 2D visible light image data, and a depth map; C-estimating the pose of a face in said test frame by aligning said depth map with a 3D model of a head of known orientation; D-mapping at least one of said 2D image on the depth map, so as to generate textured image data; E-projecting the textured image data in 2D so as to generate data representing a pose-rectified 2D projected image.
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP KR)
G06T 7/50 (2016.12 - KR); G06T 7/70 (2016.12 - EP KR); G06V 20/653 (2022.01 - EP KR); G06V 40/16 (2022.01 - EP KR); G06T 2207/10024 (2013.01 - EP KR); G06T 2207/10028 (2013.01 - EP KR); G06T 2207/10048 (2013.01 - EP KR); G06T 2207/20068 (2013.01 - EP KR); G06T 2207/20182 (2013.01 - KR); G06T 2207/30201 (2013.01 - KR)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2016045711A1
Citation (examination)
- ROBERT NIESE ET AL: "A Novel Method for 3D Face Detection and Normalization", JOURNAL OF MULTIMEDIA, 5 September 2007 (2007-09-05), XP055191108, DOI: 10.4304/jmm.2.5.1-12
- GABRIELE FANELLI ET AL: "Real Time Head Pose Estimation from Consumer Depth Cameras", 31 August 2011, PATTERN RECOGNITION, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 101 - 110, ISBN: 978-3-642-23122-3, XP019163424
- ZHENYUE CHEN ET AL: "RGB-NIR multispectral camera", OPTICS EXPRESS, vol. 22, no. 5, 24 February 2014 (2014-02-24), pages 4985, XP055191777, DOI: 10.1364/OE.22.004985
- MALASSIOTIS SOTIRIS ET AL: "Combining 2D and 3D face images for reliable identity verification", 2005 13TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, IEEE, 4 September 2005 (2005-09-04), pages 1 - 4, XP032759420, ISBN: 978-1-60423-821-1, [retrieved on 20150401]
- "Image-Based Rendering", 28 September 2006, ISBN: 978-0-387-21113-8, article HEUNG-YEUNG SHUM: "Image-Based Rendering", XP055646647
- IOANNIS A KAKADIARIS ET AL: "Three-Dimensional Face Recognition in the Presence of Facial Expressions: An Annotated Deformable Model Approach", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, vol. 29, no. 4, 1 April 2007 (2007-04-01), pages 640 - 649, XP011168503, ISSN: 0162-8828, DOI: 10.1109/TPAMI.2007.1017
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2016045711 A1 20160331; EP 3198522 A1 20170802; KR 20170092533 A 20170811
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2014070282 W 20140923; EP 14772329 A 20140923; KR 20177010873 A 20140923