EP 3452500 A4 20191211 - MESENCHYMAL STEM CELL PROLIFERATION
Title (en)
MESENCHYMAL STEM CELL PROLIFERATION
Title (de)
PROLIFERATION VON MESENCHYMALEN STAMMZELLEN
Title (fr)
PROLIFÉRATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES MÉSENCHYMATEUSES
Publication
Application
Priority
- HU P1600306 A 20160506
- US 2017031585 W 20170508
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2017193134A1] The invention relates to a use of serum fraction of platelet rich fibrin (SPRF) for increasing mesenchymal stem cell (MSC) proliferation rate wherein said differentiated MSCs maintain their potential to differentiate in several cell types. The invention also relates to SPRF for use in therapy, wherein in said therapy SPRF obtained from a donor subject used to increase proliferation rate of the patients MSCs.
IPC 8 full level
C07K 14/75 (2006.01); A61K 35/28 (2015.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/36 (2006.01); A61L 27/36 (2006.01); A61L 27/54 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/0775 (2010.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 35/28 (2013.01); A61L 27/3616 (2013.01); A61P 19/00 (2018.01); C07K 14/75 (2013.01); C12N 5/0663 (2013.01); C12N 2502/115 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 2009010896 A1 20090108 - CENTENO CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al
- [Y] CHI-SHENG CHIEN ET AL: "Incorporation of exudates of human platelet-rich fibrin gel in biodegradable fibrin scaffolds for tissue engineering of cartilage", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH PART B: APPLIED BIOMATERIALS, vol. 100B, no. 4, 25 May 2012 (2012-05-25), pages 948 - 955, XP055111158, ISSN: 1552-4973, DOI: 10.1002/jbm.b.32657
- [Y] SU C Y ET AL: "In vitro release of growth factors from platelet-rich fibrin (PRF): a proposal to optimize the clinical applications of PRF", ORAL SURGERY, ORAL MEDICINE, ORAL PATHOLOGY, ORAL RADIOLOGY AND ENDODONTICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 108, no. 1, 1 July 2009 (2009-07-01), pages 56 - 61, XP026434162, ISSN: 1079-2104, [retrieved on 20090517]
- [XY] THIERRY BURNOUF ET AL: "Human blood-derived fibrin releasates: Composition and use for the culture of cell lines and human primary cells", BIOLOGICALS, vol. 40, no. 1, 1 January 2012 (2012-01-01), pages 21 - 30, XP055111162, ISSN: 1045-1056, DOI: 10.1016/j.biologicals.2011.09.017
- See also references of WO 2017193134A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2017193134 A1 20171109; EP 3452500 A1 20190313; EP 3452500 A4 20191211
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2017031585 W 20170508; EP 17793552 A 20170508