EP 4339313 A1 20240320 - STREAMLINED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALUMINUM-SCANDIUM ALLOY
Title (en)
STREAMLINED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALUMINUM-SCANDIUM ALLOY
Title (de)
STROMLINIENFÖRMIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ALUMINIUM-SCANDIUM-LEGIERUNG
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ SIMPLIFIÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-SCANDIUM
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 202263375717 P 20220915
- US 202318177429 A 20230302
Abstract (en)
An alloy product is produced by an aluminothermic reduction process and an alloying process with one or more other metals or master alloy, where the reduction process and the alloying process are performed in a single stage. The final alloy product may have a scandium concentration that is greater than 0% and less than about 2%. According to another aspect of the present disclosure, a first melt is produced at a first melt temperature, a melting and alloying step is performed at a second melt temperature, less than the first melt temperature, and the temperature of the first melt is not substantially less than the second melt temperature before the melting and alloying step.
IPC 8 full level
C22B 5/04 (2006.01); C22B 1/10 (2006.01); C22B 5/02 (2006.01); C22B 21/02 (2006.01); C22B 21/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 1/03 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C22B 1/10 (2013.01 - EP); C22B 5/02 (2013.01 - EP); C22B 5/04 (2013.01 - EP); C22B 21/02 (2013.01 - EP); C22B 21/04 (2013.01 - EP); C22C 1/026 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 1/03 (2013.01 - EP); C22C 1/057 (2023.01 - US); C22C 21/00 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 2019218645 A1 20190718 - RICKETTS NIGEL [AU]
- US 2019218644 A1 20190718 - RICKETTS NIGEL [AU]
- US 2018087129 A1 20180329 - MANN VIKTOR KHRIST'YANOVICH [RU], et al
Citation (search report)
- [X] CN 113005312 A 20210622 - LUO CHAOWEI
- [X] CN 113444913 A 20210928 - UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG
- [X] CN 1605641 A 20050413 - HUNAN RES INST OF RARE EARTH M [CN]
- [X] RU 2426807 C2 20110820 - DALUR AOZT [RU]
- [Y] CN 111187951 A 20200522 - SOUTHWEST ALUMINUM (GROUP) CO LTD
- [A] RU 2213795 C1 20031010 - MAKHOV SERGEJ VLADIMIROVICH
- [A] US 2020407863 A1 20201231 - POWELL ADAM CLAYTON [US], et al
- [A] CN 102337406 A 20120201 - HEBEI SITONG NEW METAL MATERIAL CO LTD, et al
- [A] US 5238646 A 19930824 - TARCY GARY P [US], et al
- [A] DE 102020208782 A1 20220120 - TANIOBIS GMBH [DE]
- [Y] SUZDALTSEV ANDREY ET AL: "A MODERN WAYS FOR Al-Sc MASTER ALLOYS PRODUCTION", 1 February 2019 (2019-02-01), XP093123593, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.researchgate.net/publication/331629410_A_MODERN_WAYS_FOR_Al-Sc_MASTER_ALLOYS_PRODUCTION> [retrieved on 20240125]
- [A] VARCHENYA P: "Synthesis and properties of aluminum master-alloy with scandium, zirconium and hafnium", 1 September 2009 (2009-09-01), XP093122032, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.researchgate.net/publication/242587358_SYNTHESIS_AND_PROPERTIES_OF_ALUMINUM_MASTER-ALLOY_WITH_SCANDIUM_ZIRCONIUM_AND_HAFNIUM> [retrieved on 20240122]
- [A] YURIY ZAIKOV ET AL: "Lab Scale Synthesis of Al-Sc Alloys in NaF-AlF<sub>3</sub>-Al<sub>2</sub>O<sub>3</sub>-Sc<sub>2</sub>O<sub>3</sub> Melt", ADVANCED MATERIALS RESEARCH, vol. 1088, 10 February 2015 (2015-02-10), pages 213 - 216, XP055636896, DOI: 10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMR.1088.213
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC ME MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 23194282 A 20230830; US 202318177429 A 20230302